TRIMBLE INC. et al v. PERDIEMCO, LLC
Plaintiff: INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC and TRIMBLE INC.
Defendant: PERDIEMCO, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02028
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal in Related Suit filed by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC.. (Tessar, Amanda)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #15 the motion for leave for Donald L. Jackson to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Donald L. Jackson on behalf of defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/30/2019. (lcjdb2)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Patrick J. Coyne on behalf of PERDIEMCO, LLC Substituting for attorney Robert F. Shaffer (Coyne, Patrick)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark.. (Tessar, Amanda)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) for Declaratory Judgment and Demand for Trial by Jury on All Issues So Triable against PERDIEMCO, LLC with Jury Demand filed by TRIMBLE INC., INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment I, #10 Attachment J, #11 Attachment K, #12 Attachment L, #13 Attachment M, #14 Attachment N, #15 Attachment O, #16 Attachment P, #17 Attachment Q)(Tessar, Amanda)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal in Related Suit filed by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Noto, Aldo)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Donald L. Jackson, :Firm- Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP, :Address- 8300 Greensboro Blvd., Suite 500, McLean, Virginia 22102. Phone No. - 5712767700. Fax No. - 5712767200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6345031. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PERDIEMCO, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald L. Jackson, #2 Proposed Order)(Noto, Aldo)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Aldo Noto on behalf of PERDIEMCO, LLC (Noto, Aldo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal in Related Suit by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Tessar, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tessar, Amanda)
August 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/8/2019. (tb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Amended) by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC. (Tessar, Amanda)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark.. (Tessar, Amanda)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Demand for Trial by Jury On All Issues So Triable against PERDIEMCO, LLC with Jury Demand filed by TRIMBLE INC., INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment I, #10 Attachment J, #11 Attachment K, #12 Attachment L, #13 Attachment M, #14 Attachment N, #15 Attachment O, #16 Attachment P)(Tessar, Amanda)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #9 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by not later than October 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/13/2019. (lcjdb2)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, (Stipulated Order Extending Time Within Which to Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Shaffer, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Frederic Shaffer on behalf of PERDIEMCO, LLC (Shaffer, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PERDIEMCO, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019 (Tessar, Amanda)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #4 the motion for leave for Amanda Tessar to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Amanda Tessar on behalf of plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/24/2019. (lcjdb2) Modified on 7/24/2019 (lcjdb2).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #3 the motion for leave for Daniel Keese to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Daniel Keese on behalf of plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/24/2019. (lcjdb2) Modified on 7/24/2019 (lcjdb2).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (zrdj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda Tessar, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400, Denver, CO 80202-5255. Phone No. - 303.291.2357. Fax No. - 303.291.2457 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6243521. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Tessar, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloodworth, Shannon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Keese, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 1120 N.W. Couch Street, 10th Floor, Portland, OR 97209-4128. Phone No. - 503.727.2000. Fax No. - 503.727.2222 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6243518. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Keese, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloodworth, Shannon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC, TRIMBLE INC. (Bloodworth, Shannon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against PERDIEMCO, LLC with Jury Demand on All Issues So Triable ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6243509) filed by TRIMBLE INC., INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment I, #10 Attachment J, #11 Attachment K, #12 Attachment L, #13 Attachment M, #14 Attachment N, #15 Attachment O, #16 Attachment P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons, #19 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Bloodworth, Shannon) (Attachment 19 replaced on 7/11/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIMBLE INC. et al v. PERDIEMCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERDIEMCO, LLC
Represented By: Aldo Noto
Represented By: Patrick J. Coyne
Represented By: Donald L. Jackson
Represented By: Robert Frederic Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INNOVATIVE SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, LLC
Represented By: Shannon M. Bloodworth
Represented By: Daniel Keese
Represented By: Amanda Tessar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIMBLE INC.
Represented By: Shannon M. Bloodworth
Represented By: Daniel Keese
Represented By: Amanda Tessar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?