CARROLL v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: LANELLE CARROLL
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02036
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (ztth)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further action from the Court or transfer by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties are relieved of any pleading, discovery, or other obligation until further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pending a ruling on such transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 13, 2019. (lcrc2)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coots Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(Coots, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LANELLE CARROLL. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-1914 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6245885) filed by LANELLE CARROLL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARROLL v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANELLE CARROLL
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?