SHIMILES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: KIFLU SHIMILES
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02044
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Snyder, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Snyder, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Yee, Marsha)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6244889) filed by KIFLU SHIMILES. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Snyder, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIMILES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIFLU SHIMILES
Represented By: David Michael Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?