LEWIS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: NOVLETTE YVONNE LEWIS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02059
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Set/Reset Deadlines Jointly Filed by ANDREW SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/11/2019. (zjd)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Cases filed that seek review on an administrative record, as here, are exempt from the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3. See LCvR 16.3(b)(1). The parties therefore shall submit a proposed schedule for dispositive motions on or before September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/28/2019. (lcapm1) Modified event title on 8/30/2019 (znmw).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ANDREW SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19, #19 Part 20, #20 Part 21, #21 Part 22, #22 Part 23, #23 Part 24, #24 Part 25, #25 Part 26)(Reed, Margaret)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by ANDREW SAUL.(Reed, Margaret)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6247735) filed by NOVLETTE Y. LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons as to Office of General Counsel, #4 Summons as to Attorney General)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVLETTE YVONNE LEWIS
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?