PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv02080
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA action are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2019. (lctjk2)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Walker, Johnny)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Walker, Johnny)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zeg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6252009) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons DOI Summons, #3 Summons AG Summons, #4 Summons USAO summons, #5 Declaration 7.1 disclosure)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Peter T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?