CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. McALEENAN et al

Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KEVIN McALEENAN and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02085
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION Jointly Filed by Plaintiffs and by KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On September 4, 2019, this Court issued an Opinion and Order ruling on the dispositive motions filed in related case No. 18-cv-655. In light of the similarities between this case and case No. 18-cv-655, and given the representations made by the parties and the Court during the August 14, 2019, telephone conference with Chambers (see Teleconf. Tr., ECF No. 18, at 11:18-12:5), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 16, 2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/9/2019. (lckbj2)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1. Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment 2. Redline of Amended Complaint against Original Complaint)(Su, Anchun)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 08/14/2019; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: 08/20/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone Number: (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
August 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Telephone Conference held in chambers on 8/14/2019. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer.) (zgdf)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #14 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event. Parties are federal defendants. (jf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing filed by KEVIN McALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Legislative History, #3 Exhibit B - Enriquez Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Martin Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - G, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/22/2019 (Su, Anchun)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN McALEENAN served on 7/22/2019 (Su, Anchun)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 7/23/2019. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 8/13/2019. (Su, Anchun) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jf).
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2019. (Su, Anchun)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #12 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the event "SERVICE OF PROCESS". (jf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE re #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA . (Su, Anchun) Modified on 8/12/2019 (jf).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/7/2019. (lckbj1)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Galen Nicholas Thorp on behalf of All Defendants (Thorp, Galen)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 , #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Brian Segee and Anthony Eliseuson are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/7/2019. (lckbj1)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KEVIN McALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-00408-TNM, 1:18-cv-00655-KBJ. (Thorp, Galen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Index of Addendum Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Add. Ex. A. IIRIRA, #4 Exhibit Add. Ex. B INA, #5 Exhibit Add. Ex. C 1996 IIRIRA, #6 Exhibit Add. Ex. D 2005 REAL ID Act, #7 Exhibit Add. Ex. E 2007 Secure Fence Act, #8 Exhibit Add. Ex. F 2008 Consolidated Approps Act, #9 Appendix Index of Supporting Declarations, #10 Declaration Decl. 1 - Flesch, #11 Declaration Decl. 2 - Girard, #12 Declaration Decl. 3 - Jacobs, #13 Declaration Decl. 4 - Jordahl, #14 Declaration Decl. 5 - Luce, #15 Declaration Decl. 6 - McKinnon, #16 Declaration Decl. 7 - Misztal, #17 Declaration Decl. 8 - Pulliam, #18 Declaration Decl. 9 - Rosen, #19 Declaration Decl. 10 - Silver, #20 Declaration Decl. 11 - Stromberg, #21 Declaration Decl. 12 - Walsh, #22 Declaration Su Declaration re: Supporting Exhibits, #23 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 1, #24 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 2, #25 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 3, #26 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 4, #27 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 5, #28 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 6, #29 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 7, #30 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 8, #31 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 9, #32 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 10, #33 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 11, #34 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 12, #35 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 13, #36 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 14, #37 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 15, #38 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 16, #39 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 17, #40 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 18, #41 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 19, #42 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 20, #43 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 21, #44 Exhibit Su Decl. Ex. 22, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Su, Anchun)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN McALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony T. Eliseuson, :Firm- Animal Legal Defense Fund, :Address- 150 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2400, Chicago, Illinois 60606. Phone No. - (707) 795-2533. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6253714. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Su, Anchun)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Segee, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 660 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1000, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - (805) 750-8852. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6253698. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Su, Anchun)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M. Crystal on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Crystal, Howard)
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Su, Anchun)
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6252317) filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Notice of Designation of Related Cases)(Su, Anchun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. McALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: Brian Paul Segee
Represented By: Anthony T. Eliseuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: Howard M. Crystal
Represented By: Brian Paul Segee
Represented By: Anthony T. Eliseuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: Brian Paul Segee
Represented By: Anthony T. Eliseuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Galen Nicholas Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN McALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Galen Nicholas Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?