ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM PULASKI, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, LAKE CUMBERLAND REGIONAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, PARKVIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL-SOUTH CAMPUS, SUMNER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PALESTINE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN TENNESSEE WINCHESTER, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ASHLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, ANDALUSIA HEALTH, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, LOGAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER SILVIS, CASTLEVIEW HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, MADISON HEIGHTS CAMPUS, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, CARONDELET SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, LIVINGSTON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER, EAST RUSHOLME STREET, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, VAUGHAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SETON WILLIAMSON, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, ASCENSION SETON HAYS, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CAROMONT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NORTH GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NATIONAL PARK MEDICAL CENTER, RALEIGH GENERAL HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, WESTERN PLAINS MEDICAL COMPLEX, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, STARK HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM LAWRENCEBURG, RIVER PARISHES HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, SOVAH HEALTH MARTINSVILLE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, AUGUSTA HEALTH, SOVAH HEALTH DANVILLE, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER and ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02089
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply ISO Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/14/2019) (zjf).
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #8 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the correct party (jf)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/8/2019) (zjf).
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/8/2019) (zjf).
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/8/2019) (zjf). Modified on 8/8/2019 (jf).
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/24/2019. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDALUSIA HEALTH, ASHLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CASTLEVIEW HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE CUMBERLAND REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LIVINGSTON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LOGAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, NATIONAL PARK MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER, OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL-SOUTH CAMPUS, PALESTINE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARKVIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, RALEIGH GENERAL HOSPITAL, RIVER PARISHES HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM LAWRENCEBURG, SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM PULASKI, SOUTHERN TENNESSEE WINCHESTER, SOVAH HEALTH MARTINSVILLE, SOVAH HEALTH DANVILLE, STARK HOSPITAL, SUMNER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VAUGHAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WESTERN PLAINS MEDICAL COMPLEX (Smith, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 17-1484. (Smith, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6253493) filed by CARONDELET SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE, ASHLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, ASCENSION SETON HAYS, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, EVANSTON HOSPITAL, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS, COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH, ASCENSION SETON WILLIAMSON, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER SILVIS, AUGUSTA HEALTH, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, CAROMONT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER, EAST RUSHOLME STREET, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, MADISON HEIGHTS CAMPUS, FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, ANDALUSIA HEALTH, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, CASTLEVIEW HOSPITAL, FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex Azar, II, #3 Summons to Jessie Liu, #4 Summons to William Barr)(Smith, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM PULASKI
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVANSTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE CUMBERLAND REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKVIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL-SOUTH CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMNER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALESTINE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AULTMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TENNESSEE WINCHESTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARONDELET HEART & VASCULAR INSTITUTE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDALUSIA HEALTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER - MAIN CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER SILVIS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASTLEVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, MADISON HEIGHTS CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMANCHE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARONDELET SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DECATUR MORGAN HOSPITAL-PARKWAY CAMPUS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVINGSTON REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENESIS MEDICAL CENTER, EAST RUSHOLME STREET
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON NORTHWEST
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAUGHAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FITZGIBBON HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON WILLIAMSON
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOWARD REGIONAL HEALTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRFIELD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUMONT HOSPITAL - FARMINGTON HILLS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON HAYS
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROMONT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH GEORGIA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALEIGH GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN PLAINS MEDICAL COMPLEX
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN TENNESSEE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM LAWRENCEBURG
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIVER PARISHES HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVAH HEALTH MARTINSVILLE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SETON MEDICAL CENTER AUSTIN
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUSTA HEALTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVAH HEALTH DANVILLE
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON PURCHASE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?