PERRY v. EBBERT
Petitioner: RANSOM J. PERRY
Respondent: DAVID J. EBBERT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02093
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying #12 Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is dismissed. See attached Order for details. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/21/2019. (lctnm1)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/21/2019. (lctnm1)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00485. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1) The report and recommendation of M.J. Arbuckle #9 is ADOPTED.2) The Clerk of Court shall transfer the petition #1 to the USDC of the District of Columbia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a),and close this file. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/12/19. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that this Petition #1 be transferred to the United States District Court of the District of Columbia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 5/31/19. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 TRAVERSE by Ransom J. Perry to #7 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by David J. Ebbert by David J. Ebbert. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Priore, S) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and PETITION served on US Attorney's Office 5/6/19. (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254, to apply those rules to this 2241 petition. 2. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the Petition #1 and this Order on the United States Attorney and to note the address of the United States Attorney on the front of the docket sheet in this case. All documents filed by the parties and by the Court shall be served upon the United States Attorney. 3. On or before May 20, 2019, the Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the allegations of the petition. 4. The Petitioner shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Respondents answer or other pleading within fourteen (14) days after its service. See Rule 5(e), 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254. 5. A determination as to whether the Petitioner shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of the Respondents answer or other pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 5/1/19. (rw) Acknowledgment of Service form along with a copy of the Petition & this Order forwarded (5/1/19) to the HBG Clerk's Office for service on the U.S. Attorney's office. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Receipt of payment from RANSOM PERRY in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 4/22/2019. Receipt number 333065447 processed by epetrosk. (jjs, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333065447. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Ransom J. Perry.(dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRY v. EBBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RANSOM J. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID J. EBBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?