HIGHT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW J. HIGHT
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD and KARL L. SCHULTZ
Intervenor Defendant: ST. LAWRENCE SEAWAY PILOTS ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02094
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 10/28/2019. Plaintiff's Motion or Notice due by 11/27/2019. Oppositions due by 12/19/2019. Reply due by 1/7/2020. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/31/2019. Defendants' Oppositions and Cross-Motions due by 2/13/2020. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition due by 3/17/2020. Defendants' Replies due by 4/16/2020. Joint Appendix due by 4/30/2020. (zjd)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER accepting the parties' #42 Joint Scheduling Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/09/2019. (lcapm3)
August 7, 2019 Filing 42 Joint STATUS REPORT by KARL L. SCHULTZ, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ST. LAWRENCE SEAWAY PILOTS ASSOCIATION.(jf)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Consent Motion to Intervene. St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association is added to this action as a defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/25/2019. (lcapm3)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene as of right by ST. LAWRENCE SEAWAY PILOTS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Lodged answer)(Longstreth, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of KARL L. SCHULTZ, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Yee, Marsha)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anthony B. Sanders is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/22/2019. (lcapm3)
July 19, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony B. Sanders, :Firm- Institute for Justice, :Address- 520 Nicollet Mall, Suite 550, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 435-3451. Fax No. - (612) 435-5875 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6265570. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MATTHEW J. HIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony B. Sanders in Support of Motion for Admission PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission of A. Sanders Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Service)(Redfern, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019. (tg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Actions for review of administrative records are exempt from the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3. See LCvR 16.3(b). Accordingly, the parties are ordered to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 7, 2019, which includes a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/19/2019. (lcapm3)
July 15, 2019 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:19-cv-80310. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Matthew J. Hight that Plaintiff will not Appeal. (Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per ECF No. #33 Order. (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is instructed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia and mark this case CLOSED in this District. All pending motions are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's REPLY to #28 Response in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Matthew J. Hight. (Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Paperless Order granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a Reply to their Motion to Transfer Venue #15 on or before June 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/28/2019. (btr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 MOTION to Change Venue by Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Captain John Boyce)(Kelman, Olivia Rae) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene by St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Response of St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF 15])(Kelman, Olivia Rae) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Matthew J. Hight. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew J. Hight)(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. Final Discovery Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Paperless Order granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay #21 in part. All pending deadlines unrelated to the Motion to Change Venue #15 are stayed until such time as the Court enters an Order on the Motion to Change Venue #15 . The Court will vacate the operative Scheduling Order #9 and enter a new Scheduling Order if necessary. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/21/2019. (btr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Matthew J. Hight (Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #9 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, by Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jeffrey H. Redfern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/15/2019. (hk02) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey H. Redfern. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11646319 by Matthew J. Hight. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint #16 . Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within 14 days of the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Change Venue #17 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/13/2019. (btr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, filed by Matthew J. Hight. Replies due by 5/17/2019. (Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue by Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Karl L. Schultz(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party United States Coast Guard(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart added. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Mark Ruge and John Longstreth. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/6/2019. (kal) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark Ruge. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11613649 by St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association. Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelman, Olivia Rae) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Longstreth. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11613581 by St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association. Attorney Olivia Rae Waters Kelman added to party St. Lawrence Seaway Pilots Association(pty:intv). Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelman, Olivia Rae) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2019., Discovery due by 10/15/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/24/2019., In Limine Motions due by 11/12/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2019., All Pretrial Motions due by 11/12/2019., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/16/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Lee Brannon and Setting Trial date: ( Calendar Call set for 1/8/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Matthew J. Hight. Karl L. Schultz served on 3/7/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; United States Coast Guard served on 3/7/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/7/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server - U.S. Attorney (served 03/13/2019), #2 Affidavit of Process Server - U.S. Attorney General (served 03/06/19))(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 and #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Anthony B. Sanders and Ben Rump. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/6/2019. (kal) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ben Rump. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11448940 by Matthew J. Hight. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony B. Sanders. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11448894 by Matthew J. Hight. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing)(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Karl L. Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT AND, SEPARATELY, THE DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACT against Karl L Schultz, United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Homeland Security. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11448345, filed by Matthew J Hight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Training Plan, #4 Exhibit B - SLSPA Articles of Assoc., #5 Exhibit C - Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit D - GLPAC-CA, #7 Exhibit E - Captain Hight Appeal Letter, #8 Exhibit F - Capt. Hight, USCG Final Decision 10/29/2018)(Pearson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGHT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL L. SCHULTZ
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ST. LAWRENCE SEAWAY PILOTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John Longstreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW J. HIGHT
Represented By: Jeffrey H Redfern
Represented By: Anthony B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?