MIECZKOWSKI v. CITY OF WARREN STATE OF MICHIGAN 37RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT et al
Plaintiff: JAMES WAYNE MIECZKOWSKI
Defendant: CITY OF OAK PARK, STATE OF MICHIGAN 45TH DISTRICT COURT, CITY OF NEW BALTIMORE, STATE OF MICHIGAN 42TH DISTRICT COURT, CITY OF ROSEVILLE, STATE OF MICHIGAN 39TH DISTRICT COURT, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MICHIGAN 12TH DISTRICT COURT, STATE OF MICHIGAN 52-4 JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT and CITY OF WARREN STATE OF MICHIGAN 37RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02095
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order by JAMES WAYNE MIECZKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit) (ztth)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Cover Letter, Proof of Service, Motion - Petition by Douglas Dwight Bennett. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. See Order 8/22/2019" Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 8/22/2019. (ztth) Modified to add text on 8/27/2019 (znmw).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing without prejudice the petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 22, 2019. (lcdlf3)
August 2, 2019 Filing fee received: $58 ($5 filing fee plus $53 returned check fee), receipt number: 4616100042. (tth) Modified on 8/28/2019 (znmw).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JAMES WAYNE MIECZKOWSKI. Case related to Case No. 2:18cv11096-DML-SDD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(znmw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616099538.) filed by JAMES WAYNE MIECZKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(znmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIECZKOWSKI v. CITY OF WARREN STATE OF MICHIGAN 37RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF OAK PARK, STATE OF MICHIGAN 45TH DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW BALTIMORE, STATE OF MICHIGAN 42TH DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ROSEVILLE, STATE OF MICHIGAN 39TH DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MICHIGAN 12TH DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MICHIGAN 52-4 JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF WARREN STATE OF MICHIGAN 37RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WAYNE MIECZKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?