CITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Plaintiff: CITIZENS UNITED
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02108
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 10, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 11, 2019. (lcdlf2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2019. (zcal)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 27, 2019. (lcdlf2)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
July 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6256558) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons to the Attorney General, #7 Summons to the State Dept, #8 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS UNITED
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?