DUNCAN v. CARSON
Plaintiff: ALEXIS DUNCAN
Defendant: BENJAMIN S. CARSON, SR.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02113
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BENJAMIN S. CARSON, SR served on 7/29/2019 (Renaud, Ellen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2019. (Renaud, Ellen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/29/19. (Renaud, Ellen)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/19/19. (lctnm1)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BENJAMIN S. CARSON, SR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by ALEXIS DUNCAN #1 Complaint, filed by ALEXIS DUNCAN. (Renaud, Ellen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN S. CARSON, SR with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6257233) filed by ALEXIS DUNCAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Renaud, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNCAN v. CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN S. CARSON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS DUNCAN
Represented By: Ellen K. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?