WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Plaintiff: WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02116
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 8/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 03)(Sedley, Alan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 02)(Sedley, Alan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01)(Sedley, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply ISO Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
August 5, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Cases 18cv222 CRC and 19cv2116 CRC have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 8/5/2019. All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that case 19-cv-2116 is CONSOLIDATED with consolidated case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (permitting sua sponte consolidation of cases presenting common questions of law or fact). All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/5/2019. (lccrc1, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
July 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zjd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER, WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L.Civ. R26.1, #2 Exhibit Notice of Designation of Related Cases)(Sedley, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER, WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 01, #3 Summons 02, #4 Summons 03)(Sedley, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER, WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-222. (Sedley, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6258083) filed by WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER, WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C.1, #4 Exhibit C.2, #5 Exhibit C.3, #6 Exhibit C.4, #7 Exhibit C.5, #8 Exhibit C.6, #9 Exhibit C.7, #10 Exhibit C.8, #11 Exhibit C.9, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons 01, #14 Summons 02, #15 Summons 03)(Sedley, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?