WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02127
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/13/19. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #7 to view.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 8/9/2019 (Martin, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 8/9/2019 (Martin, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Kristina R. Van Bockern's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Kristina R. Van Bockern may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/24/2019. (lcrdm3, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Hadassah M. Reimer's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Hadassah M. Reimer may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/24/2019. (lcrdm3, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hadassah M. Reimer, :Firm- Holland & Hart LLP, :Address- 25 S. Willow, Suite 200. Phone No. - (307) 739-9741. Fax No. - (307) 739-9744 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6273483. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martin, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristina R. Van Bockern, :Firm- Holland & Hart LLP, :Address- 555 Seventeenth St., Suite 3200. Phone No. - (303) 295-8107. Fax No. - (720) 545-9952 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6273452. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martin, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/19/2019. (lcrdm3, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY (Martin, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6261084) filed by WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Bernhardt, #3 Summons Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement)(Martin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN ENERGY COMPANY
Represented By: John Charles Martin
Represented By: Hadassah M. Reimer
Represented By: Kristina R. Van Bockern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?