FAHEY v. GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Defendant: GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02128
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 the parties' joint motion for a protective order. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/22/2019. (lcjdb2)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brownstein, Henry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Florida Court Dismissal Order, #2 Exhibit B - Florida Complaint)(Brownstein, Henry)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #13 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY; emailed to smoskowitz@kasowitz.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Refer to LcvR 5.1(a) and (d) regarding Correspondence and Form of Documents. (ztd, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Florida Court Dismissal Order, #2 Exhibit B - Florida Complaint)(Moskowitz, Seth) Modified on 8/20/2019 (ztd).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to oppose defendant's motion to dismiss, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any opposition to #8 defendant's motion to dismiss by not later than seven (7) days after the Court enters an order resolving plaintiff's motion to remand. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/8/2019. (lcjdb2)
August 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall exchange jurisdictional discovery requests by 8/9/2019; The parties shall respond to jurisdictional discovery requests by 9/16/2019; Defendant shall file any opposition to plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand by 9/26/2019; Plaintiff shall file any Reply in support of the Motion to Remand by 10/7/2019. (jth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, Or Stay MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filing of Plaintiff's Opposition by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Willcox, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/7/2019. (lcjdb2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Proposed Order by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brownstein, Henry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Willcox, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, Or Stay by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Of Henry Brownstein, #3 Exhibit A: Unparalleled Belgian Heritage, #4 Exhibit B: History of Godiva, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brownstein, Henry). Added MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION to Stay on 7/26/2019 (znmw).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #7 the motion for leave for Brian S. Choi to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Brian S. Choi on behalf of defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/24/2019. (lcjdb2)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #6 the motion for leave for Seth A. Moskowitz to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Seth A. Moskowitz on behalf of defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/24/2019. (lcjdb2) Modified on 7/24/2019 (lcjdb2)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian S. Choi, :Firm- Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP, :Address- 1633 Broadway New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 506-3308. Fax No. - (212) 500-3595 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6269748. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Brownstein, Henry)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Seth A. Moskowitz, :Firm- Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP, :Address- 1633 Broadway New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 506-1757. Fax No. - (212) 835-5057 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6269732. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Brownstein, Henry)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zeg)
July 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA re: Notice of Removal by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Brownstein, Henry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry B. Brownstein on behalf of GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Brownstein, Henry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC. (Brownstein, Henry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019CA003515B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6261210 filed by GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brownstein, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAHEY v. GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GODIVA CHOCOLATIER, INC.
Represented By: Henry B. Brownstein
Represented By: Seth A. Moskowitz
Represented By: Brian S. Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?