HUBBARD v. GIPSON
Plaintiff: ZANE HUBBARD
Defendant: CONNIE GIPSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02140
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Receipt on 08/30/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:19-cv-05492 sent by California Northern District. (zrdj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California, pursuant to the Court Order entered 07/24/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of California. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/23/2019. (zmc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ZANE HUBBARD (zmc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against CONNIE GIPSON filed by ZANE HUBBARD.(zmc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/18/2019) (zmc). Modified event title on 7/25/2019 (znmw).
July 15, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/15/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUBBARD v. GIPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE GIPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZANE HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?