ROBERTS v. BRENNAN et al
Plaintiff: ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR.
Defendant: MEGAN BRENNAN and ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02160
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Receipt on 08/23/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 4:19-cv-00207 sent by Southern District of Georgia. (zrdj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Georgia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 08/01/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/8/2019. (zjd) Modified on 8/9/2019 (zjd).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/30/2019. (zmc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR (zsb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER ACOSTA, MEGAN BRENNAN with Jury Demand filed by ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR.(zsb)
July 15, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/15/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. BRENNAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST S. ROBERTS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?