WALLACE v. MCCONNELL et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN P. WALLACE
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20 and MITCH MCCONNELL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02168
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Vacate is DENIED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/18/2019. (lcjeb1)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate #3 Order, #4 Memorandum & Opinion, MOTION for Relief from Judgment, MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid by STEPHEN P. WALLACE (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Because there is no reason that this case should be sealed, the Court ORDERS that it be unsealed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/2/2019. (lcjeb2)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #3 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2019. (lcjeb2)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2019. (lcjeb2)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by STEPHEN P. WALLACE re #1 Complaint (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Attachment) (tth)
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOHN DOES 1-20, MITCH MCCONNELL (zjf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 7/29/2019.....COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-20, MITCH MCCONNELL ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616099836) with Jury Demand filed by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf); Modified on 8/1/2019 (ztth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALLACE v. MCCONNELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCH MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN P. WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?