CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Defendant: ANDREW WHEELER, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02181
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wheeler, #2 Summons EPA, #3 Summons AG, #4 Summons USAO)(Sus, Nikhel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW WHEELER served on 7/30/2019; U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 7/30/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/31/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2019.) (Sus, Nikhel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW WHEELER, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6273232) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DOJ, #3 Summons EPA, #4 Summons USAO, #5 Summons Wheeler)(Sus, Nikhel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?