NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION v. MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Defendant: ROBERT A. VANDRUNEN and MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02273
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Consent Judgment by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Judgment)(Inomata, Margaret)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Jeanah Park and Nusra Ismail are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/29/2019. (lctjk3)
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/11/2019, (ztth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC. served on 8/21/2019; answer due 9/11/2019 (Inomata, Margaret); Modified text on 8/29/2019 (ztth).
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT A. VANDRUNEN served on 8/21/2019; answer due 9/11/2019. (Inomata, Margaret); Modified text on 8/29/2019 (ztth).
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nusra Ismail, :Firm- Vedder Price, P.C., :Address- 222 North LaSalle Street. Phone No. - (312) 609 7500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6345070. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nusra Ismail in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeanah Park, :Firm- Vedder Price, P.C., :Address- 222 North LaSalle Street. Phone No. - (312) 609 7500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6345003. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanah Park in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #3 #4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. In the supporting declarations attached to the motions, each declarant does not certify that he or she "either has or has not been disciplined by any bar" as required by LCvR 83.2(d)(4). Rather, the declarants represent only that they are "currently in good standing with all states, courts, and bars" in which they are admitted. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2019. (lctjk3)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nusra Ismail, :Firm- Vedder Price, P.C., :Address- 222 North LaSalle Street. Phone No. - (312) 609 7500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6341238. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nusra Ismail in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeanah Park, :Firm- Vedder Price P.C., :Address- 222 North LaSalle Street. Phone No. - (312) 609 7500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6341214. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanah Park in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC., ROBERT A. VANDRUNEN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC., ROBERT A. VANDRUNEN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6288141) filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Midwest Railroad Materials, Inc. d/b/a RM inc., #5 Summons - Robert A. Vandrunen)(Inomata, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION v. MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Represented By: Nusra Ismail
Represented By: Jeanah Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT A. VANDRUNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST RAILROAD MATERIALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?