CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02282
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Hao-Chin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hao-Chin Hubert Yang on behalf of All Defendants (Yang, Hao-Chin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 8/8/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 8/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Verification)(Uhlemann, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Verification)(Uhlemann, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Verification)(Uhlemann, Sarah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Sanerib on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Sanerib, Tanya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Uhlemann, Sarah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6289550) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Bernhardt, #3 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Uhlemann, Sarah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/1/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?