MAKELL v. FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Plaintiff: STACEY A. MAKELL
Defendant: FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, TRANSPORTATION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION and CU MEMBERS MORTGAGE COLONIAL SAVINGS, F.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02364
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (3) Issued as to CU MEMBERS MORTGAGE COLONIAL SAVINGS, F.A., FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, TRANSPORTATION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (zeg)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #3 Motion for TRO. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/13/2019. (zsb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by STACEY A. MAKELL (zsb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STACEY A. MAKELL (zsb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CU MEMBERS MORTGAGE COLONIAL SAVINGS, F.A., FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, TRANSPORTATION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION with Jury Demand filed by STACEY A. MAKELL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
August 6, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/06/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAKELL v. FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDCHOICE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSPORTATION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CU MEMBERS MORTGAGE COLONIAL SAVINGS, F.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY A. MAKELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?