STRZOK v. BARR et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: PETER STRZOK
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FBI DIRECTOR CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, Attorney General WILLIAM F. BARR, WILLIAM F. BARR and CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Petitioner: DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02367
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5262 for #21 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (zrdj)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of All Defendants (Humphreys, Bradley)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Document Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #21 Notice of Appeal. (jf)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #20 Leave to File Denied, #19 Leave to File Denied, by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Amicus/Notice submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED" Signed by Amy B. Jackson, USDJ on 09/17/2019. (jf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Amicus/Notice66 submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Movants Motion to Intervene has not yet been granted" Signed by Amy B. Jackson, USDJ on 09/12/2019. (jf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notices submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED, Motion to Intervene Still Pending" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Filing) (zjf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/27/2019. (Goelman, Aitan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (zjf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Friend Of The Court Brief submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file in this case denied unless and until motion to intervene is granted" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/26/2019. (jf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by PETER STRZOK.(Goelman, Aitan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER striking #13 Motion for Reconsideration. The movant has filed a motion to intervene in this case which is still pending. Unless and until it has been ruled upon in the movant's favor, he may not file pleadings on the docket absent leave of this court to do so. Moreover, a motion for reconsideration is inappropriate at this time since the court has not issued any rulings in this matter that could be reconsidered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/2019. (lcabj2)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/23/19.....MOTION for Reconsideration by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf) Modified on 8/23/2019 (jth).
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Attachment Z to the Motion to Intervene filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. "Leave to file Attachment Z, Copies of pleadings file in other cases DENIED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/15/2019. (jf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, "Leave to file GRANTED. Only 3 pages Motion to Intervene (not the attachments) " "Leave to file Attachment Z, Copies of pleadings file in other cases DENIED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/15/2019 (jf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/08/2019. (Goelman, Aitan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Salzman on behalf of PETER STRZOK (Salzman, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PETER STRZOK re Order,, Set Deadlines, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Quinn, Julia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Theresa Quinn on behalf of PETER STRZOK (Quinn, Julia)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Minute Order of August 8, 2019 is amended as follows: plaintiff should not provide his home address to the Clerk's office. Instead, plaintiff must file a notice under seal containing plaintiff's home address by August 12, 2019. Such information shall remain under seal and withheld from disclosure until otherwise directed by this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/9/2019. (lcabj2)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/09/19.....MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion to Deviate from Local Civil Rule 5.1(c). Plaintiff may omit his home address from the complaint, but he must provide this information to the Clerk's Office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/2019. lcabj2) Modified on 8/9/2019 (jth).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM F. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zjd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Deviate From Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by PETER STRZOK (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goelman, Aitan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM F. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6303726) filed by PETER STRZOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Attorney General William F. Barr, #3 Summons to United States Department of Justice, #4 Summons to FBI Director Christopher A. Wray, #5 Summons to Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Goelman, Aitan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM F. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6303726) filed by PETER STRZOK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General William F. Barr, # 3 Summons to United States Department of Justice, # 4 Summons to FBI Director Christopher A. Wray, # 5 Summons to Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Goelman, Aitan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRZOK v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI DIRECTOR CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General WILLIAM F. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM F. BARR
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER STRZOK
Represented By: Aitan Dror Goelman
Represented By: Richard A. Salzman
Represented By: Julia Theresa Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?