AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02395
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019 (hs)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report and briefing schedule on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 1, 2019. (lctfh4).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Anthony on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Peterson, Benton)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/14/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zeg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6308657) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Cerissa Cafasso
Represented By: Katherine Marie Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?