SHANK v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TAMIKA S. SHANK
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02400
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ANDREW SAUL. (Reed, Margaret)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ANDREW SAUL.(Reed, Margaret)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/15/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW SAUL served on 8/15/2019. (ztth)
August 12, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management. (zad)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING Case to Random Magistrate Judge for Full Case Management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/12/2019. (lcjeb3)
August 9, 2019 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth)
August 8, 2019 Summons (1) Issued as to ANDREW SAUL. (tth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance - Pro Bono by Barbara E. Butterworth on behalf of TAMIKA S. SHANK. (tth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100105) filed by TAMIKA S. SHANK. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANK v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA S. SHANK
Represented By: Barbara E. Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?