LEE v. USCIS et al
Plaintiff: IOU-HUNG LEE
Defendant: SARAH KENDALL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Not Yet Classified: KEVIN MCALEENAN, USCIS and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv02407
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Schaye, Adam); Modified text and event on 10/2/2019 (ztth).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/14/2019. (lctnm3)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, SARAH KENDALL, KEVIN MCALEENAN, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zjd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA corrected caption by IOU-HUNG LEE. (Schaye, Adam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS of IOU-HUNG LEE against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, SARAH KENDALL, USCIS, KEVIN MCALEENAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6310796) filed by IOU-HUNG LEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USCIS, #3 Summons Acting Sec. of DHS, #4 Summons Chief of IPO USCIS, #5 Summons Acting director of USCIS)(Schaye, Adam) Modified event title on 8/19/2019 (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. USCIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU-HUNG LEE
Represented By: Adam R. Schaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?