ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND, SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, VHS WEST SUBURBAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., AMISUB, VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC, VHS OF PHOENIX, INC., THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE CHAMBERSBURG HOSPITAL, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC., VHS HARLINGEN HOSPITAL COMPANY, ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02411
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Inclusion In Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bryce, Peter)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Amended) by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, AMISUB, AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, THE CHAMBERSBURG HOSPITAL, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND, TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC., VHS BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, VHS HARLINGEN HOSPITAL COMPANY, VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC., VHS OF PHOENIX, INC., VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC, VHS WEST SUBURBAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC., LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS WEST SUBURBAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,, HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC., DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC., VHS OF PHOENIX, INC., SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC., VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC., LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., AMISUB, VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC, ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC., THE CHAMBERSBURG HOSPITAL, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C., TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC., HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC., THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL, VHS HARLINGEN HOSPITAL COMPANY, FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED, PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC., DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC., VHS BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Webster, Stephanie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of All Defendants (Bryce, Peter)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR MORE LIMITED CONSOLIDATION by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND re #6 Notice (Other),,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Stephanie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/16/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/15/2019 (Keough, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND CROSS-MOTION FOR MORE LIMITED CONSOLIDATION by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Stephanie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Webster on behalf of ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND (Webster, Stephanie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1134. (Keough, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM, DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND (Keough, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6313298) filed by MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC., MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC., MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND, LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y., MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS, CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Keough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE NEW ENGLAND HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT MICHAEL'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER OF BURLINGTON COUNTY, A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY, N.Y.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT CCMC, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITY HEALTH NEW ENGLAND
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSTON NORTHWEST OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA VISTA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRYE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENET HOSPITALS LIMITED
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS WEST SUBURBAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE POINTE OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT OF WEST PHOENIX, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SAN ANTONIO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF PHOENIX, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CHAMBERSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 3, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 7, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWIN CITIES COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL - BARTLETT, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER OF MODESTO, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS ACQUISITION SUBSIDIARY NUMBER 9, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLACENTIA-LINDA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS OF ARROWHEAD, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS HARLINGEN HOSPITAL COMPANY
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIALEAH HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?