OLEKANMA v. CHIPPENDALE et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL OLEKANMA
Defendant: MARK CATER, LATHANE LINTON, TAPHANY WASHINGTON, JUDITH EKHELAR, RITA AWUNGTIA, PATRICK OKAFOR, MICHELLE PACHECO, KEVIN BRANCH, UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS, MARISSA A. RANDOLPH, SAMANTHA KELLY, MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE, PAMELA THOMPSON, TENAKA DUNK, KENYETTA STEWART and RENEE SOUNDERS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02415
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by RITA AWUNGTIA, KEVIN BRANCH, MARK CATER, MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE, TENAKA DUNK, JUDITH EKHELAR, SAMANTHA KELLY, LATHANE LINTON, PATRICK OKAFOR, MICHELLE PACHECO, MARISSA A. RANDOLPH, RENEE SOUNDERS, KENYETTA STEWART, PAMELA THOMPSON, UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS, TAPHANY WASHINGTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Ratliff, Merrilyn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARISSA A. RANDOLPH served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019 (jf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by SAMUEL OLEKANMA. (jf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Default by SAMUEL OLEKANMA (jf)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RITA AWUNGTIA served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; KEVIN BRANCH served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; JUDITH EKHELAR served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; PATRICK OKAFOR served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; MICHELLE PACHECO served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; PAMELA THOMPSON served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019; TAPHANY WASHINGTON served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(jf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Ratliff, Merrilyn)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/27/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 9, 2019 Summons (15) Issued as to RITA AWUNGTIA, KEVIN BRANCH, MARK CATER, MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE, TENAKA DUNK, JUDITH EKHELAR, SAMANTHA KELLY, LATHANE LINTON, PATRICK OKAFOR, MICHELLE PACHECO, MARISSA A. RANDOLPH, RENEE SOUNDERS, KENYETTA STEWART, PAMELA THOMPSON, TAPHANY WASHINGTON. (jf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN BRANCH, MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE, LATHANE LINTON, MICHELLE PACHECO, MARK CATER, PAMELA THOMPSON, TAPHANY WASHINGTON, RENEE SOUNDERS, RITA AWUNGTIA, TENAKA DUNK, KENYETTA STEWART, JUDITH EKHELAR, PATRICK OKAFOR, MARISSA A. RANDOLPH, SAMANTHA KELLY, UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100150) with Jury Demand filed by SAMUEL OLEKANMA. (Attachments: #1 ExhibitS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLEKANMA v. CHIPPENDALE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CATER
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATHANE LINTON
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPHANY WASHINGTON
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH EKHELAR
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA AWUNGTIA
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK OKAFOR
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE PACHECO
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN BRANCH
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISSA A. RANDOLPH
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA KELLY
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARRET CHIPPENDALE
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA THOMPSON
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENAKA DUNK
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENYETTA STEWART
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE SOUNDERS
Represented By: Merrilyn Elise Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL OLEKANMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?