BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL-WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - MARY'S AVENUE CAMPUS, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - BROADWAY CAMPUS, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS, SSM SAINT CLARE HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH CENTER and BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Case Number: 1:2019cv02422
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Inclusion In Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bryce, Peter)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR (Bryce, Peter)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR served on 8/19/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/19/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - BROADWAY CAMPUS, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - MARY'S AVENUE CAMPUS, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT CLARE HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL-WEST, SSM SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6313699) filed by HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - BROADWAY CAMPUS, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SSM SAINT CLARE HEALTH CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS, SSM SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH CENTER, THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL, SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL-WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - MARY'S AVENUE CAMPUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #6 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #7 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM GOOD SAMARITAN REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL-WEST
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - MARY'S AVENUE CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL - BROADWAY CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO HOSPITALS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT CLARE HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLOOMSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?