PEJCIC v. GACKI et al
Plaintiff: Mile Pejcic
Defendant: ANDREA M. GACKI and OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02437
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08-19-2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix certified mail receipt)(Robinson, Peter)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix certified mail receipt)(Robinson, Peter)
August 31, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREA M. GACKI served on 8/22/2019; OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/19/2019. (See Docket Entry #3 to view document) (jf)
August 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MILE PEJCIC of summons and complaint. (Robinson, Peter)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ANDREA M. GACKI, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6316145) filed by Mile Pejcic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Robinson, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/13/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEJCIC v. GACKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mile Pejcic
Represented By: Peter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA M. GACKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?