PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC v. BORDES et al
Plaintiff: PennyMac Holdings, LLC
Defendant: ALL PERSONS CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AS 4228 RENO ROAD, N.W WASHINGTON, DC 20008 and CHANTEL BORDES
Case Number: 1:2019cv02442
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' appearance and/or response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 10/28/2019. (hmc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/9/19. (lctnm1)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication to Remove Cloud on Real Property Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1655 by PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Martin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC (Schreiber, Martin)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/13/2019. (lctnm1)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CHANTEL BORDES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHANTEL BORDES and ALL PERSONS CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AS 4228 RENO ROAD, N.W WASHINGTON, DC 20008 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6317346) filed by PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to Chantal Bordes, #9 Summons to All Persons Claiming an Interest in the Real Property Known as 4228 Reno Road, N.W.)(Schreiber, Martin) Modified docket text on 8/13/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNYMAC HOLDINGS, LLC v. BORDES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Martin Harold Schreiber, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL PERSONS CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AS 4228 RENO ROAD, N.W WASHINGTON, DC 20008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANTEL BORDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?