HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, JANA BABUSZCZAK, WILLIAM COON, KRISTI QUAINTANCE, PAULINE STOTSENBERG and HUMANE SOCIETY LEGISLATIVE FUND
Defendant: SONNY PERDUE, KEVIN SHEA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL REGISTER, ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE and OLIVER POTTS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02458
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiffs' Complaint due by 10/18/2019, (mac)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2019. (lcegs3)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL REGISTER, SONNY PERDUE, OLIVER POTTS, KEVIN SHEA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/8/2019. (lcegs3)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL REGISTER, SONNY PERDUE, OLIVER POTTS, KEVIN SHEA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Westmoreland, Rachael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Lynn Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (Westmoreland, Rachael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(O'Brien, Claudia)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/27/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler S. Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams, Tyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zjd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUMANE SOCIETY LEGISLATIVE FUND (O'Brien, Claudia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (O'Brien, Claudia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6320493) filed by KRISTI QUAINTANCE, PAULINE STOTSENBERG, HUMANE SOCIETY LEGISLATIVE FUND, JANA BABUSZCZAK, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, WILLIAM COON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to United States Department of Agriculture, #9 Summons to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, #10 Summons to Office of the Federal Register, #11 Summons to Sonny Perdue, #12 Summons to Kevin Shea, #13 Summons to Oliver Potts, #14 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #15 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DC)(O'Brien, Claudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONNY PERDUE
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN SHEA
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL REGISTER
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVER POTTS
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANA BABUSZCZAK
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM COON
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTI QUAINTANCE
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINE STOTSENBERG
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY LEGISLATIVE FUND
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: Tyler S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?