ALPHAPOINTE et al v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
Plaintiff: WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND and ALPHAPOINTE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE and DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Intervenor Defendant: PDS CONSULTANTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02465
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answers due by 11/12/2019. (zjd)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendants the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, the Secretary of the VA, and the United States shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before 11/12/2019. Intervenor-defendant PDS Consultants shall respond to the complaint on or before 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/16/2019. (lcapm3)
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT WILKIE served on 9/10/2019 (Roach, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 9/10/2019 (Roach, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2019. (Roach, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (Roach, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wechsler, Peter)
September 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/16/2019. (zjd)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Intervenor's Consent Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending a Consolidated Briefing Schedule. Intervenor's time to respond to the complaint is hereby stayed. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/12/2019. (lcapm3)
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending a Consolidated Briefing Schedule by PDS CONSULTANTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallacher, David)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. See attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2019. (lcapm3)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roach, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT OF ORAL ARGUMENT PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 27, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-91. Date of Issuance: August 29, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cou rt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2019.(wz)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND (Roach, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE regarding Related Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE (Echols, Alexis)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Letter to Chambers))(Echols, Alexis)
August 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Oral Argument held on 8/27/2019 re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Roach, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene by PDS Consultants. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/26/2019. (lcapm3)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roach, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PDS CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallacher, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE. (Echols, Alexis)
August 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, any oppositions to Putative Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, and Putative Intervenor's opposition due by 8/21/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order due by 8/26/2019. Oral Argument set for 8/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
August 19, 2019 MINUTE ORDER. Any opposition to Putative Intervenor's #10 Motion to Intervene shall be filed by August 21, 2019. Putative Intervenor may provisionally file an opposition to #3 Plaintiff's motion for emergency relief by August 21, 2019. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 08/19/2019. (lcapm3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PDS CONSULTANTS, INC. (Gallacher, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by PDS CONSULTANTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallacher, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before August 21, 2019, Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before August 26, 2019, and Oral Argument is set for August 27, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10, before Judge Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/16/2019. (lcapm3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of All Defendants (Wechsler, Peter)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echols, Alexis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT WILKIE re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Echols, Alexis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case as not related. (ztnr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND (zrdj)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALPHAPOINTE (zrdj)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, ROBERT WILKIE, and U.S. Attorney (zrdj)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LCvR 65.1, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit to Memorandum of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND. Case related to Case No. 17-992. (zrdj)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100222) filed by ALPHAPOINTE, WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALPHAPOINTE et al v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alexis J. Echols
Represented By: Peter T. Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: Alexis J. Echols
Represented By: Peter T. Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Alexis J. Echols
Represented By: Peter T. Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINSTON-SALEM INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND
Represented By: John L. Roach, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPHAPOINTE
Represented By: John L. Roach, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: PDS CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: David Scott Gallacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?