MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER, U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. NAVY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE and BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02478
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file an answer or other response to the complaint by October 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/24/2019. (lcabj3)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. NAVY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY served on 8/27/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/15/2019. (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. NAVY served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2019. (London, Ronald)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burke, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave of Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/22/19. (DMK)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP, :Address- 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-276-6500. Fax No. - 415-276-6599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6334602. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(London, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
August 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (London, Ronald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6325743) filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Summons Dept. of Justice, #10 Summons FBI, #11 Summons Dept. of Defense, #12 Summons Dept. of Interior, #13 Summons National Park Service, #14 Summons Bureau of Indian Affairs, #15 Summons U.S. Navy, #16 Summons U.S. Army, #17 Summons U.S. Air Force, #18 Summons Defense Manpower Data Center, #19 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #20 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(London, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ARMY
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. AIR FORCE
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. NAVY
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Represented By: Ronald G. London
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?