WHITE et al v. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Plaintiff: HATTIE WHITE and RAYMOND HOLTON
Defendant: EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02508
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/31/2019. (znbn)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 31, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aist, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6330875) filed by RAYMOND HOLTON, HATTIE WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons SUMMONS)(Lightfoot, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE et al v. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: James S. Aist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HATTIE WHITE
Represented By: William P. Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND HOLTON
Represented By: William P. Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?