ESPANA v. BLACK SALT FISH LLC et al
Plaintiff: ERICK JOSE BARRERA ESPANA
Defendant: BLACK SALT FISH LLC and JEFF BLACK
Case Number: 1:2019cv02509
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 10/29/2019. (mac)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/16/2019. (lcegs2)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Complaint by JEFF BLACK, BLACK SALT FISH LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calamis, Nat)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/30/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to JEFF BLACK, BLACK SALT FISH LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6331122) filed by ERICK JOSE BARRERA ESPANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Blacksalt Fish LLC, #3 Summons Jeff Black)(Melehy, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESPANA v. BLACK SALT FISH LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK SALT FISH LLC
Represented By: Nat Peter Calamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BLACK
Represented By: Nat Peter Calamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICK JOSE BARRERA ESPANA
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?