ACCURSO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ACCURSO
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02540
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received from ANTHONY ACCURSO in the amount of $23.00, receipt number: 4616101063. (zrdj)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/19. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (ztd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/19/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/19/2019 (ztd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/10/19. (DM)
September 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zad)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is obligated to pay an initial partial filing fee of $22.63 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/03/2019. (zad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (zjd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (zjd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTHONY ACCURSO. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope)(zjd)
August 19, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACCURSO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ACCURSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?