CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND et al v. ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC
Plaintiff: RICHARD TRAVIS, DENNIS DONAHOU, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, ANDRIS J. SILINS and KEVIN LONG
Defendant: ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02551
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Jensen on behalf of CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS (Jensen, Casey)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of CASEY M. JENSEN. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/10/2019. (lcjeb3)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Casey M. Jensen, :Firm- DeCarlo & Shanley, :Address- 533 South Fremont Avenue, 9th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90071. Phone No. - 213-488-4100. Fax No. - 213-488-4180 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6439905. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casey M. Jensen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Brian)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Case randomly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg as the case is not a related case. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zeg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ERRATA Regarding the Caption of the Complaint filed on August 23, 2019 by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS #1 Complaint, filed by DENNIS DONAHOU, RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS. (Attachments: #1 Amended Caption of the Complaint Filed on August 23, 2019)(Quinn, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Amended Exhibit to #4 Notice (Other) (Amended Exhibit 2 to Complaint Filed August 23, 2019) by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS. (Quinn, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Errata Regarding Exhibit 2 to the Complaint Filed on August 23, 2019 by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS re #1 Complaint, (Quinn, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-01600. (Quinn, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS (Quinn, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6338447) filed by RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, ANDRIS J. SILINS, KEVIN LONG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Quinn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND et al v. ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TRAVIS
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS DONAHOU
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRIS J. SILINS
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN LONG
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Represented By: Casey M Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION MANUFACTURING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?