VERNON v. BARR
Plaintiff: LONNIE GENE VERNON
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2019cv02565
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Receipt on 09/30/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:19-cv-01681 sent by Middle District of Pennsylvania. (zrdj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to the Court Order entered 9/9/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. See Order for details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/29/2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/09/2019. (lccrc3)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616100372.) filed by LONNIE GENE VERNON. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERNON v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE GENE VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?