NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02617
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 39 U.S.C. ยง 409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 9-25-19; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance:10-10-19. Court Reporter Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 d ays, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2020.(Griffith, Lisa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits (Exhibits 1-7))(Bor, Victoria)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE to the Court by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Campbell, Rhonda)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
September 25, 2019 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/25/2019. Oral arguments submitted on Motion #2 for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (zlsj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration McAdams Supplemental Declaration)(Campbell, Rhonda)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 Civil Statement Concerning Live Testimony or Cross-Examination at the Preliminary Injunction Hearing from Plaintiff National Association of Letter Carriers. (Bor, Victoria)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's #17 Civil Statement, the Court ORDERS that no testimony will be necessary at the PI hearing. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/20/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (znmw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Brian Renfroe)(Bor, Victoria)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Brian Renfroe)(Bor, Victoria) Modified link on 9/16/2019 (znmw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Brian Renfroe)(Bor, Victoria)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (Bor, Victoria)
September 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 9/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JOSHUA ELLISON. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/06/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KATE M. SWEARENGEN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/06/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of PETER DECHIARA. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/06/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's discovery conference call, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and its Reply for its PI Motion and Discovery Motion are due by September 13, 2019; 2) Defendant's Reply on its Motion to Dismiss is due by September 20, 2019; and 3) A hearing on the PI Motion shall take place on September 25, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/06/2019. (lcjeb2)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decarlo Declaration, #2 Exhibit Decarlo Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Faber Declaration, #4 Declaration Gauthier Declaration, #5 Exhibit Gauthier Declaration Exhibit 1, #6 Declaration Gotkin Declaration, #7 Declaration McAdams Declaration)(Campbell, Rhonda)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Campbell, Rhonda)
August 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrdj)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO #1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO, #7 Request for Summons to Issue filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO. (Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS.(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Ellison, :Firm- Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP, :Address- 900 Third Avenue, Suite 2100, New York, New York 10022. Phone No. - 212-356-0216. Fax No. - 646-473-8207 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6348448. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Ellison)(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kate M. Swearington, :Firm- Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP, :Address- 900 Third Avenue, Suite 2100, New York, New York 10022. Phone No. - 212-356-0216. Fax No. - 646-473-8207 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6348441. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kate Swearington)(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter DiChiara, :Firm- Cohen, Weiss and Simon LLP, :Address- 900 Third Avenue, Suite 2100, New York, New York 10022. Phone No. - 212-356-0216. Fax No. - 646-473-8207 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6348408. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter DiChiara)(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Document Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian Renfroe, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Renfroe Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Tonya Vaughan, #4 Declaration Declaration of S. Hall, #5 Declaration Declaration of Chinh Q Tran, #6 Declaration Declaration of Deadrick Johnson, #7 Declaration Declaration of Diane Willis, #8 Declaration Declaration of James Tamba, #9 Declaration Declaration of P. Mounier, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on PI Motion)(Bor, Victoria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6348248) filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bor, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LETTER CARRIERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Victoria Louise Bor
Represented By: Kate M. Swearengen
Represented By: Joshua J. Ellison
Represented By: Peter D. Dechiara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?