LEWIS v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE OWENS LEWIS
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02628
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (1) Issued as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (zjd)
September 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zjd)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs. GRANTEDN", Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/18/2019. (zrdj) Modified on 9/26/2019 (zrdj).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADRIENNE OWENS LEWIS (zeg).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by ADRIENNE OWENS LEWIS.(zeg).
August 30, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/30/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE OWENS LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?