HSM OF AMERICA LLC v. MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD.
Plaintiff: HSM of America LLC
Defendant: MICHILIN PROSERITY CO., LTD. and MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02652
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence T. Kass. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 21, 2019. (CR)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
September 18, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD. (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by HSM OF AMERICA LLC #1 Complaint, filed by HSM OF AMERICA LLC. (Colella, Ugo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lawrence T. Kass, :Firm- Culhane Meadows PLLC, :Address- 100 Park Avenue 16th Floor NY, NY 10017. Phone No. - 914-564-5694. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6357918. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HSM of America LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence T. Kass, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colella, Ugo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6357846) filed by HSM of America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colella, Ugo) Modified docket text on 9/5/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSM OF AMERICA LLC v. MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSM of America LLC
Represented By: Ugo A. Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHILIN PROSERITY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHILIN PROSPERITY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?