L.M.-M. et al v. CUCCINELLI et al
Plaintiff: V.M.-M., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., M.A.-H., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., B.O.-G. and B.M.-M.
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Amicus Curiae: MORTON ROSENBERG
Case Number: 1:2019cv02676
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (Lewis, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Amici's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 14, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joseph Carl Cecere is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2019. (lcrdm2, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Electronic Filing by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index-Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Certification of Administrative Record, #3 Exhibit Administrative Record)(Ramkumar, Archith)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Caudill-Mirillo, #2 Declaration of Paul Johnson, #3 Declaration of Michelle Monroe, #4 Declaration of Julianna Blackwell)(Ramkumar, Archith)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of All Defendants (Ramkumar, Archith)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMICUS BRIEF by MORTON ROSENBERG. (ztd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Morton Rosenberg's unopposed motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief, Dkt. 13, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The brief that Mr. Rosenberg attached to his motion, Dkt. 13-1, is hereby deemed FILED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/08/2019. (lcrdm2, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Carl Cecere, :Firm- Cecere PC, :Address- 6035 McCommas Blvd.. Phone No. - 469-600-9455. Fax No. - NA Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430083. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MORTON ROSENBERG (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Carl Cecere, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lipper, Gregory)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by MORTON ROSENBERG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief) (jf)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 11, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Bradley Jenkins is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2019. (lcrdm2, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bridget Cambria, #2 Declaration of Shalyn Fluharty, #3 Declaration of L.M.-M., #4 Declaration of M.A.-H., #5 Declaration of Andrea Meza, #6 Declaration of Catherine Monk and Exhibits, #7 Declaration of Dr. Anita Ravi, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bradley Jenkins, :Firm- Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., :Address- 8757 Georgia Ave., Suite 850, Silver Spring, MD 20910. Phone No. - (301) 565-4820. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6404536. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
September 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before 9/27/2019; Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before 10/21/2019; Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before 10/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, Dkt. 8, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern future proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before September 27, 2019; Defendants shall file their opposition on or before October 21, 2019; and Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before October 28, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on December 3, 2019, at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/26/2019. (lcrdm2, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Michael Kurz on behalf of All Defendants (Kurz, Julian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Manoj Govindaiah on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Govindaiah, Manoj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Stipulation by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II served on 9/12/2019; KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 9/12/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/12/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/13/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lewis, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES (Lewis, John)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/11/2019. (lcrdm2, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(ztd)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED ORDER re #2 SEALED MOTION filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, B.O.-G., S.G.-C., L.M.-M., B.M.-M., V.M.-M., I.M.-A..(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 9/6/19.(ztd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(ztd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100516) filed by S.G.-C., B.M.-M., M.A.-H., I.M.-A., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, L.M.-M., B.O.-G., V.M.-M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.M.-M. et al v. CUCCINELLI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Julian Michael Kurz
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Julian Michael Kurz
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Julian Michael Kurz
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Julian Michael Kurz
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.M.-M.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.-C.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.-H.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M.-A.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.-M.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.O.-G.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.-M.
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Bradley Jenkins
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MORTON ROSENBERG
Represented By: Gregory M. Lipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?