HENSON v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: Belinda Henson
Defendant: Marie Newman and HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Not Yet Classified: Alfred Michael
Case Number: 1:2019cv02734
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/5/2019. (nbn)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by November 11, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/5/2019. (lcjeb1)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (through November 11) by HOWARD UNIV. FACULTY PRACTICE PLN., HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, ALFRED MICHAEL, MARIE NEWMAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana)
October 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise Respond by 11/1/2019. (nbn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by November 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/24/2019. (lcjeb1)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (November 1) by HOWARD UNIV. FACULTY PRACTICE PLN., HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, ALFRED MICHAEL, MARIE NEWMAN (Arnold, Ariana)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/18/2019. (nbn)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/8/2019. (lcjeb1)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through October 18, 2019 by HOWARD UNIV. FACULTY PRACTICE PLN., HOWARD UNIVERSITY, HOWARD UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, ALFRED MICHAEL, MARIE NEWMAN (Arnold, Ariana)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/3/2019. (znbn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 3, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/23/2019. (lcjeb1)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Complaint, (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, Alfred Michael, Marie Newman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA re Caption on removal by HOWARD UNIVERSITY, Alfred Michael, Marie Newman Notice of Corrected Docket Entry. (Arnold, Ariana)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Notice (Other) was entered in error as duplicative.(zeg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Removal by HOWARD UNIVERSITY re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Complaint as served on Howard)(Arnold, Ariana) Modified on 9/16/2019 (zeg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by HOWARD UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6374213) from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 002707 B filed by HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint as served on Howard, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice filed with DC Superior Court)(Arnold, Ariana) Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct docket entry text (zeg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/18/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENSON v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Ariana Wright Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alfred Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?