YADAV v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: ROOPALI YADAV
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, USCIS and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv02735
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2019. (Brooks, Samantha)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Cirino, Paul)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail)(Brooks, Samantha)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail)(Brooks, Samantha)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/24/2019 (Brooks, Samantha)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROOPALI YADAV ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6374245) filed by ROOPALI YADAV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Brooks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YADAV v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOPALI YADAV
Represented By: Samantha Leader Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?