HAM et al v. RISCH et al
Plaintiff: YASSINE HAM and CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH, JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA, EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI and CARL RISCH
Case Number: 1:2019cv02760
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS delivery confirmation)(Benach, Ava)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS delivery confirmation)(Benach, Ava)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI served on 9/30/2019; JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA served on 9/30/2019; CARL RISCH served on 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, #2 USPS delivery confirmation)(Benach, Ava)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI, JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI, YASSINE HAM #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by YASSINE HAM, CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI. (Benach, Ava)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by YASSINE HAM, CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by YASSINE HAM, CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI.(Benach, Ava)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380046) filed by YASSINE HAM, CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #5 Summons Summons - Barr, #6 Summons Summons - Liu, #7 Summons Summons - Ramotowski, #8 Summons Summons - Rasamimanana, #9 Summons Summons - Risch)(Benach, Ava) Modified on 9/19/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAM et al v. RISCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD J. RAMOTOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASSINE HAM
Represented By: Ava C. Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAIMAE KHAOULANI EL IDRISSI
Represented By: Ava C. Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?