THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY and UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02763
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint)(Craigmyle, Bradley)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alek Pivec is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm2)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm2)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jason T. Cohen (Craigmyle, Bradley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Cohen, Jason)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2019. (Polston, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/19/2019. (Polston, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/20/2019 (Polston, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alek Pivec, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 200,Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 626-2914. Fax No. - (202) 626-3737 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6380389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Polston, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL (Polston, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380295) filed by THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC., VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC., OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION, PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE, RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION, THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS, CARILION MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Polston, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEFIORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE UNIVERSITY OF IOWA
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OAKWOOD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCHSNER CLINIC FOUNDATION
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BEAUMONT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM - EAST REGION
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER INC
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRISMA HEALTH - UPSTATE
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH CARE ST. LOUIS
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARILION MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S - ROOSEVELT HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?