ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL and ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02818
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR II (Humphreys, Bradley)
November 4, 2019 Case Stayed. (zcdw)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of a decision on appeal of American Hospital Association v. Azar, 18-cv-2841 (D.D.C), or, if there is no appeal, by January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/4/2019. (lcrmc1)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and/or Exhaustion of Appellate Rights by ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY, AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings)(MacCarthy, Sara)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY, AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER. (MacCarthy, Sara)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 10/7/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/08/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2019.) (MacCarthy, Sara)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE no later than November 4, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed as moot. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/21/2019. (DAS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zeg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-2841. (MacCarthy, Sara) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY, AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER (MacCarthy, Sara) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6388299) filed by ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM, ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET, AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON, AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH, ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ALEX M. AZAR II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Alex M. Azar II, #4 Summons US Atty General, #5 Summons District Atty, D.C.)(MacCarthy, Sara) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT ANDERSON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA SHEBOYGAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER-JOLIET
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AULTMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SE WISCONSIN HOSPITAL-ST. JOSEPH CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL AT AMSTERDAM
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA WEST ALLIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OSHKOSH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN PITTSBURG
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL WARREN CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER WASHINGTON COUNTY
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION BORGESS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER MANITOWOC COUNTY
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF BURLINGTON
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTICARE RMC-ATLANTIC CITY CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER KENOSHA
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER SAINT MARY CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?