CENTRO PRESENTE, INC. et al v. MCALEENAN et al
Plaintiff: M. DOE, R. KOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., C. LOE, CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. POE, F. ROE and J. P. LOE
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Acting Commissioner MARK MORGAN, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, WILLIAM BARR and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2019cv02840
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen V Mayer on behalf of CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Mayer, Kristen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N Thomases on behalf of CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Thomases, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Kantar Gardner on behalf of CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Gardner, Deborah)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE re #4 Order to Show Cause, . (Park, Chong)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Deborah K. Gardner, Kirsten V. Mayer, and Andrew N. Thomases are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/22/2 019. (JAG)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew N. Thomases, :Firm- Ropes & Gray LLP, :Address- 1900 University Ave 6th Floor, East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2284. Phone No. - 650-617-4000. Fax No. - 650-617-4090 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6462015. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Park, Chong)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kirsten V. Mayer, :Firm- Ropes & Gray LLP, :Address- Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street, Boston, MA 02199-3600. Phone No. - 617-951-7000. Fax No. - 617-951-7050 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6461959. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Park, Chong)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Deborah K. Gardner, :Firm- Ropes & Gray LLP, :Address- Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street, Boston, MA 02199-3600. Phone No. - 617-951-7000. Fax No. - 617-951-7050 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6461863. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, J. P. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE, F. ROE (Park, Chong)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that, on or before October 22, 2019, Plaintiffs shall SHOWCAUSE as to why the instant case should not be STAYED pending resolution ofproceedings in Make the Road New York v. McAleenan, 19-cv-2369. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2019. (jag)
October 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2369. (zsb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed anonymously by CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., M. DOE, R. KOE, C. LOE, I. MOE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., M. POE (Park, Chong)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6391224) filed by I. MOE, M. DOE, M. POE, PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC., R. KOE, CENTRO PRESENTE, INC., F. ROE, C. LOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case, #3 Summons)(Park, Chong)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTRO PRESENTE, INC. et al v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. DOE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. KOE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. MOE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIONEER VALLEY WORKERS CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. LOE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRO PRESENTE, INC.
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. POE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. ROE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P. LOE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Kristen V Mayer
Represented By: Andrew N Thomases
Represented By: Deborah Kantar Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner MARK MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?