SELIG et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Plaintiff: AMANULLAH WAHEED, ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ALYA WAHEED, D.S., J.S., BARBARA B. KANTOR, MINA WAHEED, LAURA L. STYRLUND, ANTHONY C. KANTOR, CHARYN F. SELIG, M.W., ESTATE OF GLENN L. SELIG, ESTATE OF PAULA L. KANTOR and ESTATE OF ABDULLAH WAHEED
Defendant: ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS and ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02889
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 10/18/2019, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Overseas Citizen Services, Daniel Klimov, Attorney Advisor, 2201 C Street, NW, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt) (ztth)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST from CHARYN F. SELIG for the Clerk to effect service of two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (See docket entry #10 to view document). (ztth)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) by D.S., ESTATE OF ABDULLAH WAHEED, ESTATE OF GLENN L. SELIG, ESTATE OF PAULA L. KANTOR, J.S., ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ANTHONY C. KANTOR, BARBARA B. KANTOR, M.W., CHARYN F. SELIG, LAURA L. STYRLUND, ALYA WAHEED, AMANULLAH WAHEED, MINA WAHEED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kalik, Tracy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by D.S., ESTATE OF ABDULLAH WAHEED, ESTATE OF GLENN L. SELIG, ESTATE OF PAULA L. KANTOR, J.S., ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ANTHONY C. KANTOR, BARBARA B. KANTOR, M.W., CHARYN F. SELIG, LAURA L. STYRLUND, ALYA WAHEED, AMANULLAH WAHEED, MINA WAHEED re #8 Order on Motion for Waiver (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Kalik, Tracy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #2 Motion. The Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, a list containing their names and residential addresses within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel Floyd R. Jenkins shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/3/2019. (lctnm3)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Floyd Ronald Jenkins, :Firm- Meridian 361 International Law Group, PLLC, :Address- 97A Exchange Street, Suite 202, Portland, Maine, 04101. Phone No. - 866-338-7087. Fax No. - 202-315-3894 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6412691. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by D.S., ESTATE OF ABDULLAH WAHEED, ESTATE OF GLENN L. SELIG, ESTATE OF PAULA L. KANTOR, J.S., ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ANTHONY C. KANTOR, BARBARA B. KANTOR, M.W., CHARYN F. SELIG, LAURA L. STYRLUND, ALYA WAHEED, AMANULLAH WAHEED, MINA WAHEED (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/30/2019. (lctnm3)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Jason Nudelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nudelman, Noel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Heideman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heideman, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Waiver of Local Rule 5.1(e) by D.S., J.S., ANTHONY C. KANTOR, ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ANTHONY C. KANTOR(Estate of Paula L. Kantor), BARBARA B. KANTOR, M.W., CHARYN F. SELIG, CHARYN F. SELIG(Estate of Glenn L. Selig), LAURA L. STYRLUND, ALYA WAHEED(Estate of Abdullah Waheed), ALYA WAHEED, AMANULLAH WAHEED, MINA WAHEED (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6398363) filed by CHARYN F. SELIG, ALYA WAHEED(Estate of Abdullah Waheed), M.W., CHARYN F. SELIG(Estate of Glenn L. Selig), MINA WAHEED, ANTHONY C. KANTOR, D.S., LAURA L. STYRLUND, ANTHONY J. KANTOR, ALYA WAHEED, J.S., AMANULLAH WAHEED, ANTHONY C. KANTOR(Estate of Paula L. Kantor), BARBARA B. KANTOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Islamic Republic of Iran, #3 Summons Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps)(Kalik, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELIG et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANULLAH WAHEED
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY J. KANTOR
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYA WAHEED
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S.
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA B. KANTOR
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINA WAHEED
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA L. STYRLUND
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY C. KANTOR
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARYN F. SELIG
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF GLENN L. SELIG
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF PAULA L. KANTOR
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ABDULLAH WAHEED
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Floyd R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?